House | 04/29/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Filed |