Senate | 05/13/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1713 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#737 | Journal Page: 2900 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2900 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Amended | 1-Geren | Journal Page: 2900 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2900 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2815 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2815 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 489 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 489 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Filed |