Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 892 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1562 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1537 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Record vote | RV#208 | Journal Page: 1537 |
House | 04/12/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1537 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1537 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1524 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Amended | 1-Phillips | Journal Page: 1524 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1524 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Postponed | 4/11/13 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 1489 |
House | 04/10/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1489 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 489 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 489 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Filed |