E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/23/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3965
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1033
|
Journal Page: 3965
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3965
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3692
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1818
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1265
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#339
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1887
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 1886
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1886
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|