E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/23/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1034
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3671
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1979
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2031
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1808
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1703
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 892
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#200
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|