House | 04/03/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1173 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 490 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 490 | |
House | 02/15/2013 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Filed |