House | 05/09/2013 | Postponed | 6/1/13 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2912 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2911 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Postponed | 5/9/13 6:00 AM | Journal Page: 2307 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2307 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Postponed | 5/3/13 6:00 AM | Journal Page: 2138 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2138 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 491 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 491 | |
House | 02/14/2013 | Filed |