House | 05/10/2013 | Point of order sustained | Rule 8, Section 13(b) | Journal Page: 3015 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Canales | Journal Page: 3014 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3014 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 494 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 494 | |
House | 02/14/2013 | Filed |