Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1348 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Menendez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1348
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 13, Nays 1; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the taxation of certain tangible personal property
 located inside a defense base development authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 379B.011, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
 (c)  A commercial aircraft to be used as an instrumentality
 of commerce that is under construction inside the authority is
 presumed to be in interstate, international, or foreign commerce
 and not located in this state for longer than a temporary period for
 purposes of Sections 11.01 and 21.02, Tax Code.
 (d)  Tangible personal property located inside the authority
 is presumed to be in interstate, international, or foreign commerce
 and not located in this state for longer than a temporary period for
 purposes of Sections 11.01 and 21.02, Tax Code, if the owner
 demonstrates to the chief appraiser for the appraisal district in
 which the authority is located that the owner intends to
 incorporate the property into or attach the property to a
 commercial aircraft described by Subsection (c).
 (e)  In this section, "commercial aircraft" means an
 aircraft under construction that is designed to be used as
 described by Section 21.05(e), Tax Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to ad valorem taxes imposed for a tax year beginning on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *