Senate | 05/14/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1801 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1801 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3054 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#773 | Journal Page: 3054 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3054 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3054 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2982 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Amended | 1-Isaac | Journal Page: 2981 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2981 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 517 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 517 | |
House | 02/15/2013 | Filed |