Senate | 05/15/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2615 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Record vote | RV#634 | Journal Page: 2615 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2615 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2615 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2538 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2538 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2538 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Postponed | 5/6/13 6:40 PM | Journal Page: 2537 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2537 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 517 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 517 | |
House | 02/15/2013 | Filed |