Senate | 05/15/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1415 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2366 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2224 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#451 | Journal Page: 2223 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2223 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2223 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2134 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2134 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Amended | 2-Phillips | Journal Page: 2134 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Phillips | Journal Page: 2133 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2133 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1191 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/06/2013 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 260 | |
House | 02/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 260 | |
House | 11/12/2012 | Filed |