House
|
05/03/2013
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 18 and Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|