House | 05/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 2174 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2174 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Filed |