House | 04/17/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/06/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 260 | |
House | 02/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 260 | |
House | 11/12/2012 | Filed |