Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB144 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 144
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 2, 2013;
 April 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a mental examination of a child subject to the juvenile
 justice system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 51.20(a), (b), (c), and (d), Family
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  At any stage of the proceedings under this title,
 including when a child is initially detained in a pre-adjudication
 secure detention facility or a post-adjudication secure
 correctional facility, the juvenile court may, at its discretion or
 at the request of the child's parent or guardian, order a child who
 is referred to the juvenile court or who is alleged by a petition or
 found to have engaged in delinquent conduct or conduct indicating a
 need for supervision to be examined by a disinterested expert,
 including a physician, psychiatrist, or psychologist, qualified by
 education and clinical training in mental health or mental
 retardation and experienced in forensic evaluation, to determine
 whether the child has a mental illness as defined by Section
 571.003, Health and Safety Code, [or] is a person with mental
 retardation as defined by Section 591.003, Health and Safety Code,
 or suffers from chemical dependency as defined by Section 464.001,
 Health and Safety Code. If the examination is to include a
 determination of the child's fitness to proceed, an expert may be
 appointed to conduct the examination only if the expert is
 qualified under Subchapter B, Chapter 46B, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, to examine a defendant in a criminal case, and the
 examination and the report resulting from an examination under this
 subsection must comply with the requirements under Subchapter B,
 Chapter 46B, Code of Criminal Procedure, for the examination and
 resulting report of a defendant in a criminal case.
 (b)  If, after conducting an examination of a child ordered
 under Subsection (a) and reviewing any other relevant information,
 there is reason to believe that the child has a mental illness or
 mental retardation or suffers from chemical dependency, the
 probation department shall refer the child to the local mental
 health or mental retardation authority or to another appropriate
 and legally authorized agency or provider for evaluation and
 services, unless the prosecuting attorney has filed a petition
 under Section 53.04.
 (c)  If, while a child is under deferred prosecution
 supervision or court-ordered probation, a qualified professional
 determines that the child has a mental illness or mental
 retardation or suffers from chemical dependency and the child is
 not currently receiving treatment services for the mental illness,
 [or] mental retardation, or chemical dependency, the probation
 department shall refer the child to the local mental health or
 mental retardation authority or to another appropriate and legally
 authorized agency or provider for evaluation and services.
 (d)  A probation department shall report each referral of a
 child to a local mental health or mental retardation authority or
 another agency or provider made under Subsection (b) or (c) to the
 Texas Juvenile Justice Department [Texas Juvenile Probation
 Commission] in a format specified by the department [commission].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *