Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1458 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gooden (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 1458
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of U.S. Highway 175 in Kaufman County as
 the Veterans Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.095 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.095.  VETERANS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY IN KAUFMAN COUNTY.
 (a) The portion of U.S. Highway 175 in Kaufman County is designated
 as the Veterans Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Veterans Memorial Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *