Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1720
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#786
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2999
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#757
|
Journal Page: 2998
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2998
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Sheets
|
Journal Page: 2992
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2992
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 496
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 496
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|