Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1439 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2204 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2175 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2175 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 523 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 523 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Filed |