E
|
06/14/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4535
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2570
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2570
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2570
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#761
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3024
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3024
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2722
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|