E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1807
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#233
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1641
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1641
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|