Senate | 05/06/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1416 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2204 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2175 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2175 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 500 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 500 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Filed |