Senate | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1265 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | RV#303 | Journal Page: 1859 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1847 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1847 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 920 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 920 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 501 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 501 | |
House | 02/20/2013 | Filed |