Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1544 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Allen (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 1544
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a county to contract with a private
 vendor for the operation of a detention facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.102, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.102.  ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY TO CONTRACT. The
 commissioners court of a county may contract with a private vendor
 to provide for the financing, design, construction, leasing,
 operation, purchase, maintenance, or management of a jail,
 detention center, work camp, or related facility. The
 commissioners court may not award a contract under this section
 unless the commissioners court requests proposals by public notice
 and not less than 30 days from such notice receives a proposal that
 meets or exceeds the requirements specified in the request for
 proposals. Before the commissioners court of a county enters into a
 contract under this section, the commissioners court of the county
 must receive the written approval of the sheriff of the county,
 which written approval shall not be unreasonably withheld, or if
 the county has a population of 2.8 million or more:
 (1)  consult with the sheriff regarding the feasibility
 of ensuring [ensure] that all services provided under the contract
 are required to meet or exceed standards set by the Commission on
 Jail Standards; or
 (2)  receive the written approval of the sheriff of the
 county, which written approval shall not be unreasonably withheld.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a contract entered into on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A contract entered into before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect when the contract was entered into,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *