House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 717 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/06/2013 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 261 | |
House | 02/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 261 | |
House | 11/13/2012 | Filed |