House | 05/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 503 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 503 | |
House | 02/20/2013 | Filed |