Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1562 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Harless, Canales (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1562
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice provided when a bail bond surety is in default.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 17.11, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Section 2 and adding Section 3 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 2.  Provided, however, any person who has signed as a
 surety on a bail bond and is in default thereon shall thereafter be
 disqualified to sign as a surety so long as the person [he] is in
 default on the [said] bond. It shall be the duty of the clerk of the
 court where the [wherein such] surety is in default on a bail
 bond[,] to notify in writing the sheriff, chief of police, or other
 peace officer[,] of the [such] default.  If a bail bond is taken for
 an offense other than a Class C misdemeanor, the clerk of the court
 where the surety is in default on the bond shall send notice of the
 default by certified mail to the last known address of the surety.
 Sec. 3.  A surety is considered to be [shall be deemed] in
 default from the time execution may be issued on a final judgment in
 a bond forfeiture proceeding under the Texas Rules of Civil
 Procedure, unless the final judgment is superseded by the posting
 of a supersedeas bond.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act to Article
 17.11, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies only to a bail bond that
 is executed on or after the effective date of this Act. A bail bond
 executed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect when the bail bond was executed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *