House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1202 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 505 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 505 | |
House | 02/20/2013 | Filed |