E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4871
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4543
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1588
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2615
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#633
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2537
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Morrison
|
Journal Page: 2537
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2537
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|