House | 05/03/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1312 | Journal Page: 2342 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 569 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 569 | |
House | 02/21/2013 | Filed |