E
|
05/24/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
05/24/2013
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 4915
|
E
|
05/13/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1702
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2939
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2940
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#754
|
Journal Page: 2939
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2939
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Motion to concur in Senate amdmts. withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2917
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Recommitted to committee
|
Administration
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Motion to recommit to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1369
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 892
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1537
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#207
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Amended
|
1-D. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Amended
|
4-D. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
2-Smith
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
3-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Smith, S. Davis, Perez, Huberty, Miles, Hernandez Luna, Elkins, Vo, Walle, Riddle, Fletcher, Colem
|
Journal Page: 1525
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1524
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|