Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1440 | |
House | 05/05/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2551 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2383 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Record vote | RV#518 | Journal Page: 2382 |
House | 05/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 02/21/2013 | Filed |