Senate | 05/16/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1901 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Record vote | RV#233 | Journal Page: 1664 |
House | 04/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1664 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1664 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1427 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 02/21/2013 | Filed |