Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1587
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2608
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#626
|
Journal Page: 2607
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2607
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2607
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2535
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2535
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2535
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 262
|
House
|
02/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 262
|
House
|
11/13/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|