E
|
06/14/2013
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3850
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5364
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1368
|
Journal Page: 5363
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5355
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3036
|
Journal Page: 5352
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5389
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3813
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3813
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1089
|
Journal Page: 3813
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5383
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5383
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3736
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3251
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3251
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3251
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4071
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA10 Estes
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA3 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 2376
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2376
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA4 Davis
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#308
|
Journal Page: 1864
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1864
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1864
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amended
|
2-White
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|