Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2637 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Record vote | RV#647 | Journal Page: 2637 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2637 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Amended | 1-Morrison | Journal Page: 2637 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2637 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Postponed | 5/7/13 1:00 PM | Journal Page: 2579 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2579 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2519 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2519 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Amended | 1-J. Sheffield | Journal Page: 2519 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2519 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/06/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 262 | |
House | 02/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 262 | |
House | 11/13/2012 | Filed |