E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3589
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3481
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3482
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#887
|
Journal Page: 3481
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3481
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3365
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 892
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#200
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1225
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 574
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 574
|
House
|
02/22/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|