Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1718 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 1718
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 17, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources; May 8, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 8, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain terminally ill individuals
 to purchase a resident hunting license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.001(1), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Resident" means:
 (A)  an individual who has resided continuously in
 this state for more than six months immediately before applying for
 a hunting license;
 (B)  a member of the United States armed forces on
 active duty;
 (C)  a dependent of a member of the United States
 armed forces on active duty;
 (D)  if approved by the director, a terminally ill
 individual who is participating in an event sponsored by a
 charitable nonprofit organization; or
 (E) [(D)]  a member of any other category of
 individuals that the commission by regulation designates as
 residents.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *