E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5442 | |
E | 05/23/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4878 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2752 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4062 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4294 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3908 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2200 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2200 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2200 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2200 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2199 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2199 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2199 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1901 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 892 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1544 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | RV#201 | Journal Page: 1521 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1521 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1521 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1489 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1489 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1489 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1005 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 575 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 575 | |
House | 02/22/2013 | Filed |