Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1588
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2570
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#591
|
Journal Page: 2569
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2569
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2569
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Huberty
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 576
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 576
|
House
|
02/22/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|