Senate | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1266 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1922 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Record vote | RV#340 | Journal Page: 1921 |
House | 04/26/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1921 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1921 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1887 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1887 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 605 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 605 | |
House | 02/22/2013 | Filed |