Senate | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1266 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | RV#303 | Journal Page: 1858 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1858 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1858 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1843 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1843 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1531 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Filed |