House | 04/29/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 579 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 579 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Filed |