House | 05/09/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2939 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 1142 | Journal Page: 2938 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 606 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 606 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Filed |