Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1846 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Carter (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 1846
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to suspension or denial of issuance or renewal of a license
 for failure to pay child support.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 232.008, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (b-1), the [The] court or Title
 IV-D agency may stay an order suspending a license conditioned on
 the individual's compliance with:
 (1)  a reasonable repayment schedule that is
 incorporated in the order;
 (2)  the requirements of a reissued and delivered
 subpoena; or
 (3)  the requirements of any court order pertaining to
 the possession of or access to a child.
 (b-1)  The court or Title IV-D agency may not stay an order
 under Subsection (b)(1) unless the individual makes an immediate
 partial payment in an amount specified by the court or Title IV-D
 agency. The amount specified may not be less than $200.
 SECTION 2.  Section 232.0135(b), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A licensing authority that receives the information
 described by Subsection (a) shall refuse to accept an application
 for issuance of a license to the obligor or renewal of an existing
 license of the obligor until the authority is notified by the child
 support agency that the obligor has:
 (1)  paid all child support arrearages;
 (2)  made an immediate payment of not less than $200
 toward child support arrearages owed and established with the
 agency a satisfactory repayment schedule for the remainder or is in
 compliance with a court order for payment of the arrearages;
 (3)  been granted an exemption from this subsection as
 part of a court-supervised plan to improve the obligor's earnings
 and child support payments; or
 (4)  successfully contested the denial of issuance or
 renewal of license under Subsection (d).
 SECTION 3.  (a) Section 232.008(b-1), Family Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to an order suspending a license that is
 rendered on or after the effective date of this Act. An order
 suspending a license rendered before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect on the date the order was rendered,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  Section 232.0135(b), Family Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies only to a notice provided under Section 232.0135(a),
 Family Code, on or after the effective date of this Act. A notice
 provided under Section 232.0135(a), Family Code, before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the notice was provided, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *