House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Filed |