Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1874 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lewis (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 1874
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an appeal from an interlocutory order of certain
 courts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.014(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person may appeal from an interlocutory order of a
 district court, county court at law, statutory probate court, or
 county court that:
 (1)  appoints a receiver or trustee;
 (2)  overrules a motion to vacate an order that
 appoints a receiver or trustee;
 (3)  certifies or refuses to certify a class in a suit
 brought under Rule 42 of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure;
 (4)  grants or refuses a temporary injunction or grants
 or overrules a motion to dissolve a temporary injunction as
 provided by Chapter 65;
 (5)  denies a motion for summary judgment that is based
 on an assertion of immunity by an individual who is an officer or
 employee of the state or a political subdivision of the state;
 (6)  denies a motion for summary judgment that is based
 in whole or in part upon a claim against or defense by a member of
 the electronic or print media, acting in such capacity, or a person
 whose communication appears in or is published by the electronic or
 print media, arising under the free speech or free press clause of
 the First Amendment to the United States Constitution, or Article
 I, Section 8, of the Texas Constitution, or Chapter 73;
 (7)  grants or denies the special appearance of a
 defendant under Rule 120a, Texas Rules of Civil Procedure, except
 in a suit brought under the Family Code;
 (8)  grants or denies a plea to the jurisdiction by a
 governmental unit as that term is defined in Section 101.001;
 (9)  denies all or part of the relief sought by a motion
 under Section 74.351(b), except that an appeal may not be taken from
 an order granting an extension under Section 74.351;
 (10)  grants relief sought by a motion under Section
 74.351(l); or
 (11)  denies a motion to dismiss filed under Section
 90.007.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 51.014(a), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, applies only to an
 appeal of an interlocutory order rendered on or after the effective
 date of this Act. An appeal of an interlocutory order rendered
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect immediately before that date, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *