Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1714 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#721 | Journal Page: 2885 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2885 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Amended | 1-McClendon | Journal Page: 2885 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2884 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2801 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2801 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2801 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1832 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 668 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 668 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Filed |