House
|
05/09/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/9/13 11:51 PM
|
Journal Page: 3012
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3012
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Callegari
|
Journal Page: 3012
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Callegari
|
Journal Page: 3012
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 10 and Rule 4, Section 11
|
Journal Page: 3011
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3011
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3006
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Pensions
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|