House | 04/24/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1809 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 698 | Journal Page: 1809 |
House | 04/22/2013 | Postponed | 4/24/13 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1713 |
House | 04/22/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1712 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Postponed | 4/22/13 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1606 |
House | 04/17/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1606 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Postponed | 4/15/13 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 1466 |
House | 04/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1465 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1104 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 586 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 586 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Filed |